SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southampton Methodist Circuit shares the purposes of the Methodist Church, set out in the Methodist Church Act, being the advancement of: 1. the Christian faith 2. any charitable or other purposes for the time being of any body of the Methodist Church or any institution subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church or any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

28 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Kathleen Matthews | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Loreen Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Matthews | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Forbes | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Duell | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Penny Thorne | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Hack | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Sue Sapsard | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bliss | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer S Hunkin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen E Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hughes | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Manosree Fordham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDMONDS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Anne Craggs | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Anthony Parkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Butterfield | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Franks | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL Joshua HACK | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
David Anthony Woodbury | Trustee | 09 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK RAYMOND PRICE | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DON SKINNER | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL IRISH | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|||||
NEIL ROGER HITCH | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINA MARJORIE LLOYD PRITCHARD BTH PGCE | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WOODMAN | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL ROBINSON | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.41k | £335.35k | £1.18m | £436.12k | £261.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.10k | £517.72k | £732.23k | £388.24k | £257.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £39.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £7.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £732.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £100.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £51.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/10/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF: A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 SHANKLIN ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 7RF
- Phone:
- 07901558317
- Email:
- richardforbes111@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window