Financial history DORCAN CHURCH SWINDON

Charity Number: 1143702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £159.83k £133.60k £133.42k £135.60k £179.01k
Total expenditure £152.85k £128.83k £133.31k £136.98k £167.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.75k £20.87k £2.95k £1.11k N/A