THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, EVESHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of all PCCs is the promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ, according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England. The PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the ecclesiastical parishes of All Saints and St Lawrence, Evesham, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £11,513 from 4 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 July 2011: Standard registration
- EVESHAM PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prajna Paramita Prakash Pal-Lad | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Palmer | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Westlake | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|||||
John Edger Ellis | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Fleetwood | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Hall-Cook | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Hall | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Fisher | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Greedy | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Greedy | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LIGGITT | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Rosie Grove | Trustee | 15 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sumpter | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN SHEEHAN | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.36k | £95.71k | £95.71k | £105.16k | £138.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.54k | £123.36k | £122.93k | £148.32k | £167.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
EXCEPTED PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Of All Saints
Market Place
EVESHAM
Worcestershire
WR11 4RW
- Phone:
- 01386442213
- Email:
- office@evesham.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window