Financial history SAARAH'S FUND

Charity number: 1143322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5 £22.82k £5.00k £24.79k £79.42k
Total expenditure £0 £23.43k £86 £18.64k £72.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A