CHINESE FAMILY FOR CHRIST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Marriage Enrichment Retreat (MER) provides knowledge and skills training for married couples to enhance relationships. In 2021, all the planned basic MER1 and advanced MER2 were cancelled due to the pandemic. During 2021, the President and some Board members made use of virtual online marriage and family meetings to promote the MER courses and to keep in touch with MER couples.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2012: Standard registration
- CFFC UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VINCENT JOO KENG LIM FCCA MA | Chair | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Delon Kit Lung HUI | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guowei HONG | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Kwok Keung Yau | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Mr Q Feng | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Chuang | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALICE YEUNG BA, MME | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GODWIN TO CPFA | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER CHING-TAI CHIU M ED, ED D | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.96k | £12.03k | £14.62k | £30.06k | £20.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.82k | £6.10k | £10.24k | £29.56k | £21.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/02/2012
Charitable objects
4.1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2. TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; 4.3. TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: 4.3.1. MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR 4.3.2. INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; AND 4.4. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 DOWDESWELL CLOSE
LONDON
SW15 5RL
- Phone:
- 02088781929
- Email:
- cffc.org.uk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window