THE COLLEGE OF ST PETER LE BAILEY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING, SCHOLARSHIP AND RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£12,428,000
Donations and legacies | £1.72m | |
Charitable activities | £7.79m | |
Other trading activities | £387.00k | |
Investments | £2.53m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,964,000
Raising funds | £1.11m | |
Charitable activities | £8.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,241,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.11m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.85m | |
Retained for future use | £2.46m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.11m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.85m | |
Retained for future use | £6.71m |
People

138 Employee(s)
31 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 12 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 July 2011: Standard registration
- ST PETER'S COLLEGE, OXFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
31 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Judith Buchanan | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof Thomas Alan Adcock Adcock | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof Randy Bruno | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bridget Penman | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hashem Abushama | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Matthew Fuchter | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Terry Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Violetta Miriam Bianca Splitter | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Janet Whalley | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Adam Kirrander | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Robert Hilton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sarah Hill | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lavanya Rajamani | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr David Alonso Monge | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Neilly | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES MONROE | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN DAVID TUFFNELL | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor MARINA MACKAY | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr INES MORENO DE BARREDA | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daron Burrows | Trustee | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SONDRA HAUSNER | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MASSIMO ANTONINI | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIMOTHY MAWSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ABIGAIL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS LAKIN | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER JOHN FOOT | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUW DORKINS FRCP FRCPATH | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LIONEL MASON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER KAIL | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr CLAIRE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFFREY NICHOLLS | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.78m | £9.24m | £11.04m | £11.49m | £12.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.38m | £8.24m | £11.26m | £9.90m | £9.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £133.80k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.16m | £3.42m | £2.74m | £1.90m | £1.72m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £56.00k | £1.00k | £85.00k | £148.00k | £387.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.69m | £4.59m | £6.34m | £7.11m | £7.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £59.00k | £615.00k | £17.00k | £25.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.69m | £1.68m | £1.87m | £2.36m | £2.53m | |
|
Income - Other | £248.00k | £167.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £137.15k | £283.00k | £385.08k | £567.05k | £23.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.45m | £7.30m | £10.21m | £8.74m | £8.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £896.00k | £921.00k | £1.01m | £1.16m | £1.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.00k | £21.00k | £23.00k | £28.00k | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £373.00k | £490.00k | £425.00k | £447.00k | £419.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £39.00k | £26.00k | £45.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £28.92m | £29.37m | £34.88m | £42.62m | £45.49m | |
|
Long-term investments | £50.33m | £59.49m | £58.85m | £58.25m | £62.19m | |
|
Other assets | £24.02m | £24.27m | £20.70m | £13.35m | £11.45m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.44m | -£1.20m | -£2.69m | -£1.71m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.66m | £23.39m | £23.79m | £23.49m | £23.42m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 22/11/1961 STATUTES 26/07/1995
Charitable objects
(A)(I) TO MAINTAIN AND PROMOTE EDUCATION RELIGION AND LEARNING FOR AND AMONG STUDENTS GENERALLY OF WHATEVER RELIGIOUS PERSUASION AND ESPECIALLY TO GIVE AID TO STUDENTS IN STRAITENED OR REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES WHO SHALL BE DEEMED WORTHY THEREOF BY ITS COUNCIL BY WAY OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS IN THE OPINION OF AND AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL BE MOST CONDUCIVE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH STUDENTS AND THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS. (II)TO TRAIN, CHERISH AND ENCOURAGE CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR ANY STUDENTS OR OTHER PERSONS INTENDING TO LABOUR FOR FOREIGN MISSIONS WITH WHICH THE MINISTRY OF THE LATE BISHOP JAMES HANNINGTON WAS PARTICULARLY IDENTIFIED. (III)TO DIFFUSE SOUND INFORMATION AND TEACHING OF AND IN CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINE IN CONFORMITY WITH HOLY SCRIPTURE AND PARTICULARLY THE PROTESTANT AND REFORMED TEACHING OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS SET FORTH IN THE BOOK OF COMMON PRAYER ANNEXED TO THE ACT OF UNIFORMITY OF 1662 AND THE 39 ARTICLES OF RELIGION AND ORDINAL AS NOW ORDINARILY BOUND UP WITH SUCH BOOK AND SO THAT THE TEACHING OF THE HALL AND THE CONDUCT OF THE SERVICES IN THE CHAPEL THEREOF SHALL BE IN ALL RESPECTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUCH PRINCIPLES. (IV)GENERALLY TO DO ALL OTHER INCIDENTAL THINGS WHICH MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO THE FURTHERANCE AND ELUCIDATION OF SUCH OBJECTS AND PRINCIPLES; (B)TO PROVIDE FOR MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD A COLLEGE WHEREIN THEY MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES OFFERED BY, AND STUDY FOR DEGREES IN, THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETERS COLLEGE
NEW INN HALL STREET
OXFORD
OX1 2DL
- Phone:
- 01865278879
- Email:
- accounts@spc.ox.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window