Financial history WORCESTER COLLEGE, OXFORD

Charity number: 1143479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.38m £12.62m £18.17m £14.72m £19.28m
Total expenditure £12.87m £13.13m £15.12m £13.85m £14.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £361.00k £354.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.02m £5.46m £9.06m £2.73m £4.25m
Income - Other trading activities £371.00k £13.00k £1.38m £2.84m £3.43m
Income - Charitable activities £5.68m £5.12m £5.94m £7.13m £9.04m
Income - Endowments £775.00k £449.00k £7.12m £46.00k £1.13m
Income - Investment £1.61m £1.66m £1.75m £2.03m £2.50m
Income - Other £475.00k £364.00k £46.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.26m £12.56m £14.39m £13.59m £14.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £607.00k £541.00k £703.00k £237.00k £289.00k
Expenditure - Governance £21.00k £24.00k £24.00k £25.00k £28.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £43.00k £34.00k £63.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £24.00k £27.00k £20.00k £25.00k