Financial history DEVON RAPE CRISIS AND SEXUAL ABUSE SERVICES

Charity number: 1144548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £494.60k £706.18k £561.97k £660.81k £685.13k
Total expenditure £461.38k £599.19k £618.51k £669.95k £694.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £117.95k £243.19k
Income from government grants £118.75k £219.35k £424.49k £446.56k £72.62k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £699.72k £12.38k £510.86k £407.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £3.50k £0 £27.86k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £541.93k £11.07k £243.19k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £654 £150 £884 £133
Income - Other N/A £5.80k £4.00k £138.00k £6.12k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £599.19k £614.21k £663.31k £684.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £9.30k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.40k £2.52k £3.00k £5.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £4.30k £6.63k £0