Financial history THE WILLOW TREE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1143460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.80k £9.11k £18.08k £24.95k £18.29k
Total expenditure £25.20k £27.71k £27.14k £31.67k £24.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.49k £750 N/A