Financial history LIVING SEED (EUROPE)

Charity number: 1143980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.02k £22.28k £8.11k £5.12k £42.15k
Total expenditure £30.99k £7.20k £10.41k £4.19k £31.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A