Financial history THE COLLEGE OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF SIR THOMAS POPE

Charity number: 1143755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.88m £9.14m £11.21m £11.25m £12.42m
Total expenditure £9.32m £8.93m £12.01m £11.90m £11.83m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £352.03k £317.84k £16.03k £32.18k £222.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.44m £2.67m £2.59m £1.52m £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities £246.89k £35.00k £102.22k £261.99k £380.02k
Income - Charitable activities £4.17m £3.65m £5.17m £5.89m £6.56m
Income - Endowments £767.13k £988.46k £137.30k £286.50k £53.85k
Income - Investment £3.44m £3.46m £3.47m £3.83m £4.47m
Income - Other £352.16k £318.17k £21.27k £36.70k £29.71k
Income - Legacies £99.87k £501.95k £581.65k £407.67k £105.52k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.43m £8.11m £11.14m £10.80m £10.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £895.02k £820.02k £862.03k £1.10m £1.09m
Expenditure - Governance £23.00k £24.00k £26.00k £31.00k £30.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.00k £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £167.00k £200.00k £257.01k £380.99k £378.95k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0