ALDERSHOT METHODIST MILITARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the work of the Methodist Church among forces communities by making grants to the Methodist Church and other Methodist bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 September 2011: Standard registration
- AMMT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Gates | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brian Mansel Roberts | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY PRESS | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|||||
SUSAN M SMITH | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILKES | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KENDALL | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARWICK | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WHITE | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev COLIN WEIR | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.01k | £56.55k | £84.71k | £80.78k | £50.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.58k | £480.64k | £136.88k | £137.41k | £69.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/09/1859 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/02/2014
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH THROUGHOUT THE ARMED FORCES ACROSS THE WORLD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: (I) PROVIDING METHODIST CHAPLAINS AND LAY WORKERS TO MINISTER TO SERVICE PERSONNEL IN THE ARMED FORCES REGARDLESS OF THEIR FAITH OR ABSENCE OF FAITH; (II) SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE METHODIST FORCES BOARD; AND 2. PERMITTING THE TRUST PROPERTY TO BE USED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE WIDER PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH (INCLUDING, IF THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT, MAINTAINING A PLACE OR PLACES OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP FOR THE USE OF BOTH MILITARY AND CIVILIAN PERSONNEL.)
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Caswell Close
FARNBOROUGH
Hampshire
GU14 8TD
- Phone:
- 07918175470
- Email:
- PETROS.HOWSON@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window