Financial history BURES COMMON LAND

Charity Number: 1144165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £4.90k £7.33k £9.99k £9.40k £9.27k
Total expenditure £5.52k £6.90k £8.42k £7.07k £6.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A