Financial history THE DEDANISTS' FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1145526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £63.83k £35.51k £40.25k £51.25k £41.70k
Total expenditure £41.22k £22.82k £35.56k £39.68k £41.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A