CHAPEL ST COMMUNITY ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We develop and deliver a range of creative arts and community projects offering wide ranging benefits to people in the Chapel St area of Salford. Weekly activities at community venues and outreach projects include mixed media arts, watercolour painting, music, dance, and photography & digital media offering increased skills, knowledge of local heritage, improved health and community engagement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Salford City
Governance
- 12 June 2012: Standard registration
- CSCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Ian Salmon | Chair | 13 December 2011 |
|
|||||||
JAMES INGLIS | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Gordon Nixon | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Kelly | Trustee | 12 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DORIS EATON | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
HAZEL BRADY | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MIKE ASPINALL | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2024 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SALFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY DELIVERING A RANGE OF CREATIVE ARTS AND COMMUNITY PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SACRED TRINITY
CHAPEL STREET
SALFORD
M3 5DW
- Phone:
- 01618342041
- Email:
- revandysalmon@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window