Financial history SNAPE INSTITUTE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 1144863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.54k £24.71k £26.23k £26.83k £67.15k
Total expenditure £8.07k £10.98k £15.59k £15.45k £50.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.83k £16.10k £1.13k £3.34k £10.50k