FRIENDS OF NIXON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL,SEGBWEMA, SIERRA LEONE

Charity Number: 1145455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports the Nixon Memorial Hospital in Segbwema Sierra Leone. It funds essential medicine provision, staff training, community health work through latrine building and health education. It facilitates voluntary medical staff to work at the hospital and also funds infrastructure projects including improvements to the water supply on the hospital site.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £190,113
Total expenditure: £81,623

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sierra Leone

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • F OF N (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR ROBERT BURNIE Chair 11 October 2014
None on record
Dr Emma Butterfield Trustee 30 November 2024
None on record
Dr Candace Beoku-Betts Trustee 30 November 2024
None on record
Michaela Fitzpatrick-Milton Trustee 19 January 2020
None on record
Janna Burnie Trustee 03 December 2017
None on record
Dr Thomas Kenny Trustee 03 December 2017
None on record
Dr Janet Barter Trustee 01 September 2015
FACULTY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS
Received: On time
Dr Richard Ronald Rhodes Trustee 05 April 2014
THE QUEENSWAY MEDICAL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
THE METHODIST CHURCH, POULTON LE FYLDE
Received: On time
KEN LAHAI SHARKA Trustee 30 November 2013
None on record
ELIZABETH CONTEH NURSE Trustee 16 January 2012
SIERRA LEONE DIABETES EDUCATION AND TREATMENT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE ORGANISATION OF SIERRA LEONEAN HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS ABROAD (TOSHPA)
Received: On time
Dr SYLVESTER YANKUBA Trustee 16 January 2012
SIERRA LEONE POVERTY RELIEF
Received: On time
ROBERT DIXON Trustee 31 October 2011
NOTTING HILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 55 days late
Notting Hill and Harlesden Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Dr JOHN DAVID COCHRANE DOCTOR Trustee 31 October 2011
REDDITCH ONE WORLD LINK - FRIENDS OF MTWARA
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £27.76k £32.13k £16.04k £34.69k £190.11k
Total expenditure £36.28k £26.46k £42.40k £35.47k £81.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 14 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11A DENBIGH ROAD
LONDON
W11 2SJ
Phone:
07398980078