SUPPORT U LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a safe place for people to discuss LGBT related issues and to offer opportunities to socialise with LGBT people. We have established our advice and support services through the drop in centre, which is integral to providing a holistic approach to supporting the needs of the Reading and surrounding area's Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual and Transgender communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £63,324 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 09 January 2012: Standard registration
- 12 July 2023: Funds received from 1151346 HEALTHWATCH READING
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Russell | Chair | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Mitchell | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Jenkins | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.15k | £237.04k | £238.42k | £247.65k | £247.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.34k | £159.86k | £168.85k | £203.62k | £203.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.17k | £75.15k | £63.32k | £63.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2012
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PERSONS (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RESIDENT IN READING) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN READING WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. (3) TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PERSONS (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RESIDENT IN READING) BY THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE TO OFFER ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Greyfriars Road
Reading
RG11NU
- Phone:
- 01183219111
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window