Financial history Caersalem Baptist Church (Caernarfon)

Charity number: 502317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £66.62k £63.43k £79.89k £81.58k £84.10k
Total expenditure £68.59k £53.63k £87.65k £85.87k £85.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.43k £5.91k