Financial history THE MARGARET ROSEMARY HARGRAVE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1144858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/09/2020 27/09/2021 27/09/2022 27/09/2023 27/09/2024
Total gross income £13.98k £6.39k £7.86k £9.63k £15.42k
Total expenditure £6.76k £24.22k £5.71k £3.60k £4.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A