Financial history ST JOHN'S UNDER 5'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1144826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £260.61k £249.04k £264.60k £245.47k £291.85k
Total expenditure £253.83k £279.50k £282.09k £232.20k £259.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £235.38k N/A
Income from government grants £248.71k £229.30k £244.97k N/A £281.07k