Financial history WARRINGTON DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1145798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £766.65k £773.29k £737.22k £716.90k £803.26k
Total expenditure £708.18k £655.33k £679.28k £703.96k £771.28k
Income from government contracts £750.53k £463.99k £602.39k £479.33k £507.33k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.19k £695 £456 £826 £79
Income - Other trading activities £0 £14.16k £714.03k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £750.53k £758.38k £22.71k £682.56k £800.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23 £54 £25 £465 £2.62k
Income - Other £13.90k £0 £0 £33.05k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £695 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £708.18k £655.33k £679.28k £703.96k £771.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.31k £655.33k £5.36k £5.40k £4.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0