BROMSGROVE & REDDITCH CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Part of The Methodist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

37 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 26 January 2012: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pearl Swanborough | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Thurston | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Leeson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Rose | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Perry | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY JANE PENISTON | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Ling | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anne Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pinfield | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Watson Mrs | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Batchelor | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Latika Singh | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Janet Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Gwynn Bamford | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Allured | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Tingle | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BROWN | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alsion Jane McAdam | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robert | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Meredith | Trustee | 29 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Gennoe | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr R Popley | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev R Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr L Last | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LLOYD MORGAN | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Barrie Godfrey Cooke | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN KENDRICK | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV ALAN ROY BIDNELL | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN Popley | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY MARGARET LAST | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE ALBERT BILL | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROBERT DUNKERS | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SHARMAN | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev TREVOR LOCKWOOD | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JAMES THOMAS | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Rev STEPHEN LEVETT | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.82k | £645.27k | £223.88k | £271.03k | £292.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.67k | £268.90k | £261.21k | £328.14k | £298.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £190.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £22.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £2.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £429.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £268.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Church Ecumenical Centre
6 Evesham Walk
Kingfisher Shopping Centre
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B97 4EX
- Phone:
- 0152764897
- Email:
- circuitofficebr5@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window