JALALIA JAMME MASJEED ENFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JJM strives to serve the needs of the local Muslim and wider non-Muslim community.We are committed to a peaceful and prosperous Enfield where communities learn from each other and work together for the common good.We hold the daily five prayers with congregation and organised many community activities such as,school visits,charity fundraising,funeral prayers,weddings,Eid celebrations and much more
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
Governance
- 15 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Sattar | Chair | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Luthful Islam | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Wahid | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Abdul Hannan | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
AKBAR KHAN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUBAR KHAN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
HA-MIM MUJIB RAHMAN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMAL KHAN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
AKTAR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Shaheen Uddin | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|||||
SAYFUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|||||
FOKRUL ISLAM | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|||||
KAMRUZ ZAMAN | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL GOFFAR QURESHI | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAZI ALAMGIR | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.91k | £194.79k | £237.69k | £361.67k | £403.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.85k | £142.96k | £156.68k | £201.39k | £256.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ENFIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS SUCH AS RAMADAN, EID, SHOBE-BORAT, SHOBE-KHADDAR, EID-E MILUD-UN-NOBI AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM.
Area of benefit
ENFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
228 HIGH STREET
ENFIELD
EN3 4EZ
- Phone:
- 02088044872
- Email:
- info@jjme.org
- Website:
-
WWW.JJME.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window