PLAYABILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide play and leisure time activities for children and young people who have disabilities. To help them to develop social skills, physical capabilities, and to support their families through: ? playschemes in school holidays which include trips out ? weekly clubs during school terms ? swimming lessons ? Splash! ? one off events such as a Christmas party
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 18 January 2012: Standard registration
- 29 July 2013: Funds received from 701589 WARRINGTON ASSOCIATION FOR SPECIAL CHILDREN
- 14 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1113597 WARRINGTON DISABILITY PARTNERSHIP
- 14 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1003675 THE CHILDREN'S ADVENTURE FARM TRUST LTD
- 14 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1073670 CAMSLEY GRANGE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
- 14 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1176369 WARRINGTON CHARITIES TRUST
- 14 April 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.31k | £98.95k | £21.23k | £22.97k | £17 | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.53k | £91.47k | £81.95k | £39.57k | £23.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £49.83k | £50.86k | £4.64k | £7.46k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE DISABILITIES AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THE PARENTS AND CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; AND 2 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO ENABLE SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window