NORTH KIRKLEES AND MORLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of church and non members..23 Churches available for prayer, contemplation,pastoral support visiting sick and beareved. We work with schools, youth elderly,supporting socially disadvantaged. Support other charities in both the UK and overseas financially and with prayer. Teaching of christianity through sermons, courses/small groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

60 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 January 2012: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
60 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev David John Barker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Victoria Pratt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Keith Caveen | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bloom | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Edmond | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Sutton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Dennis Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Margaret Gibson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Canning | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Cutts | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Reece | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Marian Lorraine Olsen | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Ann Mary Coates | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE OLDROYD | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Alex Yesudas | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Arnold Godfrey Nicholson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Stewart High | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Allyson Leo Henry | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Mary Crowther | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia June Cordner | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Marsia Brancken | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Abbott | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Antony Curry | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Raymond Kipling Coates | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Christine Yelland | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARGARET WOODS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Annette Elaine Hutchinson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Janet Linda Miles | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WETHERILL | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH GOLDSWORTHY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Pratt | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Perry | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christine Audrey Hawke | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN WADE | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND JOHN ANTHONY SANTRY | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER WINTERBURN | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jeffrey Wilson | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN SANTRY | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE JANE HOLT | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE HALLSWORTH | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE PATTERSON | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARA LEWIS | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THORNTON | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HICKS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SANDS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DIXON | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER GRAHAM | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PATTISON | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ELIZABETH KING | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY RYAN | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Crossley | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
HARRY EASTWOOD | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JACK RAYMOND TODD | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Anthony Santry | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Rosalind Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Keith Martin Pratt | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £410.29k | £445.59k | £449.00k | £373.87k | £368.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459.67k | £460.43k | £428.00k | £391.00k | £389.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 July 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 September 2023 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 September 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 September 2022 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Resource Centre
Batley Methodist Church
Commercial Street
Batley
Batley
West Yor
- Phone:
- 01924480382
- Email:
- icca24wilsonwra@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window