Financial history PASTOS VERDES

Charity Number: 1147099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.48k £44.92k £41.64k £43.87k £50.57k
Total expenditure £44.01k £32.14k £43.07k £70.32k £46.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A