INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING DESIGNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IED is a professional body for those who study, research, practice or manage engineering and product design. The IED works with education to develop courses in teaching and training relevant to design, promotes the excellence of good design to the wider community and assesses and regulates members in their work, for the public good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malta
Governance
- 30 January 2012: Standard registration
- 12 November 2013: Funds received from 269879 THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING DESIGNERS
- IED (Working name)
- INSITUTION OF ENGINEERING DESIGNERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Yuen CEng MIED | Chair | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Timbrell MIED | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mazher Mohammed MIED | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kay Bond CEng MIED | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Eamon Michael Tarrant RCP MIED | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Harrison-Furse MIED | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jeffries CEng MIED | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Michelle Roberts CEng MIED | Trustee | 11 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lynch CEng MIED | Trustee | 11 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Penn CTPD MIED | Trustee | 11 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eujin Pei CTPD MIED | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Nathan Channell CEng MIED | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Philip Jamie Sewell FIED | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY KEEGAN | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Watson CTPD FIED | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Farrell CEng FIED | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Phelps | Trustee | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Hardy Castle | Trustee | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BENFIELD CENG FIED | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN TREACY | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW TIZZARD | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON VAITKEVICIUS | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.77k | £281.68k | £321.45k | £283.91k | £298.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.02k | £301.05k | £276.37k | £270.90k | £334.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 23/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE INSTITUTION IS HEREBY CONSTITUTED ARE: (I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGICAL PRODUCT DESIGN AND, MORE PARTICULARLY, THE SPECIES OF KNOWLEDGE AND APPLICATION WHICH DISTINGUISHES ENGINEERING DESIGN AND THE PROFESSION DIRECTLY CONCERNED WITH ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGICAL PRODUCT DESIGN; AND (II) TO CONSTITUTE A BODY OF MEMBERS QUALIFIED IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST TO A GENERALLY RECOGNISED HIGH STANDARD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING
DESIGNERS
COURTLEIGH
WESTBURY LEIGH
WESTBURY
BA13 3TA
- Phone:
- 01373822801
- Email:
- ied@ied.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window