ROCHDALE COUNCIL OF MOSQUES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Activities and Achievements ? Safeguarding Training for all Imams ? Respect for All Religions ? Birthday of the Prophet Celebrations ? Islam Awareness Training ? Spoken Urdu Training ? Inter Mosque Competition ? Drugs Awareness Training ? Fire Safety Awareness ? Cemetery Consultation ? Cancer Awareness Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rochdale
Governance
- 11 September 2012: Standard registration
- RCM AND RCOM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dobir Miah | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Riaz Ul Haq | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Muhammad Zaman | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ansar Mahmood | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Khalid Mahmood | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
IRFAN CHISTI | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MOHAMMED ATHAR | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ZAHIR IHSAN | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
TAHIR MAHMOOD | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
SHAUKAT ALI | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
ALI ASGHAR | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ARUS MIAN | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
TALIB KHAN | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HAFIZ ABDUL MALIK | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MUSHTAQ AHMAD | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.27k | £11.51k | £4.00k | £81.46k | £43.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.73k | £1.36k | £19.24k | £80.91k | £49.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.30k | £11.50k | N/A | £19.70k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 FEB 2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 497
Rochdale
OL16 9AT
- Phone:
- 01706 655322
- Email:
- info@rcom.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window