Financial history ST IVES SCHOOL OF ART

Charity number: 1146825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £397.37k £529.53k £558.48k £569.02k £557.24k
Total expenditure £380.90k £500.86k £598.48k £564.32k £533.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £119.21k £65.60k £5.33k £1.67k £5.63k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £106.86k £54.00k £15.53k £24.51k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £2.26k £0 £4.03k £5.79k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £419.27k £499.80k £545.06k £512.01k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.14k £1.03k £4.41k £14.93k
Income - Other N/A £0 £3.65k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £2.95k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £465.25k £563.45k £538.16k £481.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £35.60k £35.03k £26.16k £52.26k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £900 £10.27k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0