Financial history THE FOUNDATION OF LADY KATHERINE LEVESON

Charity number: 1146710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.72m £1.98m £1.78m £1.90m £1.95m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.57m £1.67m £1.75m £1.91m
Income from government contracts £85.14k £76.04k £92.22k £190.96k £375.22k
Income from government grants £6.14k £108.04k £92.93k £10.85k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.60k £12.87k £38.67k £32.09k £24.39k
Income - Other trading activities £1.89k £36 £1.09k £1.66k £1.63k
Income - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.55m £1.33m £1.49m £1.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £304.36k £304.56k £314.08k £357.29k £386.79k
Income - Other £7.69k £110.32k £96.66k £12.01k £1.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £25.50k £6.40k £15.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.39m £1.45m £1.53m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £180.50k £182.00k £216.74k £216.80k £255.58k
Expenditure - Governance £18.43k £22.41k £20.60k £18.88k £20.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £15.00k £525 £574 £35.17k
Expenditure - Investment management £180.50k £182.00k £216.74k £216.80k £255.58k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0