THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS, ARBORFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of public worship, teaching, evangelism of Christ our Lord and pastoral work throughout the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 04 April 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ARBORFIELD PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Iain Alexander Lingwood | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Louise Kershaw | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hughes | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MCBURNIE | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Green | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Kershaw | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Frank Brown | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ELIZABETH CALDWELL | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW PHILIP KEARNS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Poppy Brown | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Pollock | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Claire Davidson Singh | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Fryer | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK MCDONNELL | Trustee | 28 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.26k | £161.55k | £175.40k | £217.90k | £126.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.32k | £158.03k | £127.63k | £108.84k | £126.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
CHURCH LANE
ARBORFIELD
READING
RG2 9HZ
- Phone:
- 01189760285
- Email:
- office@abch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window