Financial history PRIESTLEY EDUCATION & TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1148021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.68k £10.53k £5.84k £3.56k £3.38k
Total expenditure £8.34k £3.72k £6.05k £5.87k £3.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A