SHROPSHIRE PARENT AND CARER COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Charity are to relieve the needs of children with disabilities and additional needs, their parents, carers and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £278,350 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 December 2012: Standard registration
- PACC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zara Bowden | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nickless | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Smith | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH THOMAS | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.10k | £23.10k | £58.87k | £53.94k | £278.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.63k | £24.54k | £38.59k | £57.67k | £186.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.20k | £20.96k | £45.77k | £50.34k | £278.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND ADDITIONAL NEEDS, THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE CREATION OF A SHROPSHIRE PARENT/CARER COMMUNITY THAT REDUCES ISOLATION AND STRENGTHENS THE CAPACITY OF PARENTS AND CARERS TO SUPPORT THEIR FAMILY; (B) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION TO INFORM AND EMPOWER PARENTS/CARERS ABOUT THE SERVICES AND ISSUES THAT AFFECT THEIR FAMILIES. (C) THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARENTS AND CARERS TO INFLUENCE THE DECISIONS THAT AFFECT THEIR FAMILIES AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO DEVELOPING SERVICES THAT MEET THE NEEDS OF THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRAB TREE COTTAGE
DUNNS HEATH
BERWICK
SHREWSBURY
SY4 3HY
- Phone:
- 01939290855
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window