MERSEY SCHOOL OF ANAESTHESIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to advance the education of medical professions in matters of medicine in general and anaesthesia in particular and to promote research for the public benefit in all aspects of those objects and to publish useful results
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 2012: Standard registration
- MSA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Edwin Ameuda Djabatey | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Nicholas Airey | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Pedder | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Charles Brooks | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raymond Stephen Ahearn | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £553.25k | £148.42k | £182.17k | £284.49k | £362.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £514.03k | £219.32k | £229.79k | £344.89k | £361.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £538.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £501.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £35.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS IN PARTICULAR IN MATTERS OF MEDICINE IN GENERAL AND ANAESTHESIA IN PARTICULAR; (2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THOSE OBJECTIVES AND TO PUBLISH USEFUL RESULTS; (3) TO PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL SELECT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27a PARK AVENUE
CROSBY
LIVERPOOL
L23 2SP
- Phone:
- 07711058555
- Email:
- david.chestnutt@msoa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window