ST AGNES ISLAND HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities that improve the educational, recreational and social facilities on the island of St Agnes, Isles of Scilly. ? To take responsibility for the restoration, improvement and maintenance of the historic St Agnes Island Hall and to co-operate with any statutory authority in the furtherance of the charity?s objects. ?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Total income includes £26,915 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isles Of Scilly
Governance
- 24 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE GOUDSMIT | Chair | 02 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tamaryn Legg | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Casey Cotton | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Eberlein | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Louise Simmonds | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.72k | £12.32k | £18.97k | £45.24k | £29.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £16.96k | £15.18k | £11.64k | £19.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.00k | £26.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 407 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF AN ISLAND HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST AGNES, ISLES OF SCILLY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAMERISK
ST. AGNES
ISLES OF SCILLY
TR22 0PL
- Phone:
- 01720422881
- Email:
- carolinegoudsmit@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window