Financial history THE NORTH WALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1146851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £517.89k £376.95k £474.33k £609.80k £620.17k
Total expenditure £442.99k £431.24k £499.72k £559.74k £680.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £362.43k N/A N/A £356.46k £359.45k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £155.46k N/A N/A £253.34k £260.73k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £442.99k N/A N/A £559.74k £680.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.00k N/A N/A £3.50k £3.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0