ST JUDE'S CHURCH, WALSALL

Charity number: 1146782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Part of the Free Church of England, we are a Church in the Chuckery area of Walsall. We hold services every Sunday morning at 10:30am, mostly following the informal Family Service, with Holy Communion being held every third Sunday. There are also Fellowship meetings, which include various activities, held as announced on Thursday evenings. A coffee and chat event is held on most Fridays.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,676
Total expenditure: £1,032

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Walsall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RIGHT REVD PAUL NIGEL HUNT BSC, MSC Chair 03 April 2012
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL TRUST
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
ST. ANDREW'S CHURCH, BENTLEY
Received: On time
MR BILL CLEMENTS Trustee 03 April 2012
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL TRUST
Received: On time
NATALIE EMMA STENSTROM BSC Trustee 03 April 2012
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDEN JEFFERSON Trustee 03 April 2012
None on record
NORMA WENDY JEFFERSON Trustee 03 April 2012
None on record
KIM SILVA Trustee 03 April 2012
None on record
JOHN SILVA Trustee 03 April 2012
None on record
SHARON NORAH CLEMENTS Trustee 03 April 2012
None on record
DOREEN MARY HAYNES Trustee 03 April 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.46k £387 £1.01k £2.01k £1.68k
Total expenditure £2.80k £1.34k £4.58k £934 £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 October 2024 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2022 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
329 Wolverhampton Road West
Willenhall
WV13 2RL
Phone:
01902607335
Email:
No information available