Financial history HELPMADINA

Charity Number: 1147700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.87k £26.23k £29.57k £40.15k £66.73k
Total expenditure £36.19k £10.46k £54.02k £31.34k £60.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A