JIGSAW(SOUTHEAST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jigsaw (South East) provides services and support to children and young people who are preparing for the loss of a family member and those who have been bereaved of a family member. We operate this service in Surrey, West Sussex and surrounding areas. We can provide 1:1 support, family groups and advice to professional in health and education. We also provide training to professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Cecilia Hughes | Chair | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Davies | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Pittman | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Judith Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Dean | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE SPRINGFORD | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.39k | £331.19k | £322.90k | £285.94k | £288.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.81k | £247.11k | £310.07k | £304.02k | £311.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.62k | £5.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SURREY AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHERE A FAMILY MEMBER HAS A TERMINAL DIAGNOSIS OR TO SUPPORT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED THE DEATH OF A CLOSE FAMILY MEMBER THROUGH ILLNESS, ACCIDENT, SUICIDE OR MURDER BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
JIGSAW (SOUTH EAST)
EAST COURT MANSION
COLLEGE LANE
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 3LT
- Phone:
- 01342313895
- Email:
- info@jigsawsoutheast.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window