ST MARINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH-BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday praying services helping the community breakfast activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 13 November 2012: Standard registration
- ST MARINA CHURCH-BRISTOL (Working name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
His Grace BISHOP ANTONY | Chair | 14 August 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Roseline Makar | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Tamer Guirguis | Trustee | 29 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Mina Louka | Trustee | 29 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Mark Galtta | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
DR Boules Morcous | Trustee | 03 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
DR IBRAHIM KAMEL BARSOUM | Trustee | 03 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
DAVID BEBAWY | Trustee | 14 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.10k | £85.92k | £103.62k | £100.36k | £92.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.05k | £95.84k | £85.32k | £98.57k | £76.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHURCH SHALL BE ADVANCING THE RELIGION OF THE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTIVES, THE CHURCH SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: 3.1 TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN PLACES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE DUE PERFORMANCE OF THE RITES OF PRAYERS, LITURGY, BAPTISM, MARRIAGE & BURIAL ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH. 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESIDENCES FOR PRIESTS 3.3 TO TEACH AND EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE COPTIC ORTHODOX COMMUNITY & OTHERS IN THE DOCTRINE AND PRACTICES OF THE ORTHODOX FAITH. 3.4 A. POWER TO COLLECT DONATIONS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS (PERIODICAL & OTHERS). B. POWER ISSUE APPEALS FOR DONATIONS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS IN CONNECTION WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHURCH. C. POWER TO ACCEPT DONATIONS AND ENDOWMENTS ON ANY SPECIAL TRUST IN CONNECTION WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHURCH. D. POWER TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS OR AIMS OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Kingston Drive
Whitley Bay
NE26 1JJ
- Phone:
- 07899 795788
- Email:
- BISHOP_ANTONY2000@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
stmarina.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window