Dorset South and West Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
comprises Methodist Churches at Bere Heath, Broadmayne, Broadwey, Chickerell, Easton, Lanehouse, Portesham, Underhill, Weymouth Bay and Wyke Regis, Uploders, Ecumenical Partnership Churches (Methodist/URC) in Bridport and Dorchester and the Methodist heritage project based at Tolpuddle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

39 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 December 2012: Previously excepted registration
- BRIDPORT AND DORCHESTER METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
39 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John David Yarrien | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Roger Lewis Phillips | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Beverley Clinton | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Timothy Tarling | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Neil Ballentine | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Maurice Smith | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roger Humphrey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esme Selina Philp | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stephen Smith | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Jane Mary Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jayne Louise Newton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ruth Lownsbrough | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN SYDNEY PARSON | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Chevis | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Scott | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev GWYNETH MARGARET OWEN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICKY SEAGRAVE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Jenner | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Nicklin | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Wells | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ross Seagrave | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Leeming | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clive Timothy Stokes | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIA JACOBSON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paula Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR David Michael Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cathrin Irene Dunford | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Gracie | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph William Fairbairn | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Barry Powell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jean Quick | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Alice Trent | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|||||
JANICE YOUNG | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HERMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephanie Jenner | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|||||
COLIN GANNAWAY | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev JOHN DENNIS WALKER | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN VALERIE Clarke | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EAGLESTONE | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.83k | £470.98k | £132.04k | £271.33k | £238.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314.15k | £293.75k | £453.04k | £384.36k | £498.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932 as amended on 16 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Wyke Road
Weymouth
DT4 9QQ
- Phone:
- 07709601567
- Email:
- weybaymc@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window