BARNABAS COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith through the preaching and proclamation of the Christian Gospel and the pastoral care of Christian people. The relief of persons who are in need through the provision of Food Bank and Money Advice which are open to all members of the community. The provision of activities for the elderly, youth & children open to all members of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 13 July 2012: Standard registration
- 09 January 2014: Funds received from 515184 BARNABAS COMMUNITY CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Adrian David Knoetze | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Birchall | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Katharine Reed | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Downward | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Llewellyn Russell Jones | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorien Fay Branfield | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Heys | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID ELWYN MATTHIAS | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.18k | £633.97k | £297.84k | £372.70k | £442.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £375.50k | £607.72k | £297.51k | £349.74k | £465.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £258.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £607.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE UNDERWRITTEN SCHEDULE HERETO, AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN AND AROUND SHREWSBURY IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE, AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE DIRECTORS SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BARNABAS CENTRE
LONGDEN COLEHAM
SHREWSBURY
SY3 7DN
- Phone:
- 01743364101
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window