Financial history ANGLICAN CATHOLIC FUTURE

Charity number: 1148825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.20k £1.24k £766 £756 £686
Total expenditure £404 £5.34k £35 £232 £192
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A