HERTFORDSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a consortium formed by the 10 Citizens Advice in Hertfordshire with the aim to generate additional funding to serve the needs of citizens in Hertfordshire; and to represent the CAB community at a county level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£1,325,185
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.31m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £217 | |
Other | £17.55k |
Total expenditure:
£1,303,803
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,263,835 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m | |
Retained for future use | £21.38k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 September 2012: Standard registration
- 12 February 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1121196 BROXBOURNE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1085882 DACORUM DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1083211 EAST HERTS CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1064996 HERTSMERE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1086489 NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE B...
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1041830 ST ALBANS DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1077414 STEVENAGE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1104392 CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE IN THREE RIVERS
- 12 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1109872 WATFORD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- HCAS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £365.18k | £378.64k | £667.64k | £814.38k | £1.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.93k | £369.71k | £691.53k | £826.34k | £1.30m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £351.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £361.91k | £553.53k | £682.60k | £1.26m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £665.03k | £810.70k | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £217 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.61k | £3.68k | £17.55k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £691.53k | £826.34k | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £672 | £1.31k | £1.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £686.58k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £137.67k | £34.02k | £106.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £112.96k | £21.26k | £71.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS AND SURROUNDING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR, BY THE ENHANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window