HODDESDON PLAYERS AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides opportunities for members to become involved in all aspects of drama through the annual production of two full-length plays and a revue of sketches and songs. The Charity also runs a programme of theatre visits and playreadings and gives members opportunities to become involved in direction, marketing, business skills, and scenery construction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £4,287 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 September 2012: Standard registration
- HODDESDON PLAYERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Martin Elson | Chair | 15 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Vicki Avril Avery | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ellis-Hall | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lorraine Holt | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Kent Gordon | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOY MARGERY TERESA MATHER | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
HILARY FIONA BURKE MARSH | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE HOPE AUSTIN | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.94k | £1.72k | £8.11k | £12.19k | £18.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.99k | £2.47k | £8.33k | £14.80k | £17.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.20k | £4.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING ARTS AND TO FURTHER PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS BY PRESENTING FOR PUBLIC PERFORMANCE, A BALANCED RANGE OF PLAYS OF ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL MERIT AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Lyttons Way
Hoddesdon
EN11 9NH
- Phone:
- 01992460838
- Email:
- Johnelson@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window