ASSOCIATION OF AFGHAN HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisstance with teaching and training of healthcare professionals in the UK Healthcare awareness programmes in the UK Career advice in the UK Provision of First Aid to Afghan cultural events in London Help with Hepatitis B programme in Afghanistan. Provision of clean drinking water in smaller scale in Afghanistan. Emergency response to natural disaster victims in Afghanistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 December 2012: Standard registration
- 24 January 2025: Funds received from 285176 THE HELPING HANDS INTERNATIONAL
- AAHP-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Enayat Modasser | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nasir Ahmad Habibi | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|||||
DR Ghani Abdulwahab | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Ihsanullah Wardak | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr QUDRAT ULLAH | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMAN SHAMS | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR KHESROW SANGARWAL MBBS | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/03/2020 | 24/03/2021 | 24/03/2022 | 24/03/2023 | 24/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.98k | £15.98k | £73.08k | £59.65k | £78.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.20k | £21.95k | £38.47k | £53.76k | £70.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF HEALTHCARE AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK AND AFGHANISTAN. C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE UK AND AFGHANISTAN, IN THE FORM OF PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
Assoc of Afghan Healthcare Prof
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 02081381199
- Email:
- aahp.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window