Light Peer Support (LTD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for mothers and pregnant women and their families who are suffering with post and ante natal depression and anxiety and other perinatal mental illness. This support includes email, telephone and text support and peer support buddying in the South Yorkshire and North Derbyshire area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £357,014 from 5 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 27 September 2012: Standard registration
- Light (Pre and post natal support) (Working name)
- Light (Pre and Post Natal support) (Working name)
- Light Peer Support (Previous name)
- LIGHT SHEFFIELD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna McGarrigle | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Curren | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SAVI ROBINSON BSC Hons | Trustee | 26 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAN CUBISON BA HONS | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.03k | £129.23k | £201.49k | £178.88k | £399.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.02k | £96.87k | £128.02k | £204.81k | £229.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £108.49k | £40.00k | £40.00k | £118.21k | £357.01k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | £23.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2012 as amended on 08 Mar 2020 as amended on 08 Mar 2020 as amended on 19 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE DIRECTED TO ALLEVIATING THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM POSTNATAL DEPRESSION AND PREGNANCY-RELATED ILLNESSES AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL) BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING AND THE ADVANCEMENT IN EDUCATION IN MATTERS RELATING TO POSTNATAL DEPRESSION AND PREGNANCY-RELATED ILLNESSES AND THEIR EFFECTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND GUIDANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Light Peer Support Limited
Knowle House
4 Norfolk Park Road
Sheffield
South Yorkshire
S2 3QE
- Phone:
- 0114 438 8962
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window