Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY EXETER

Charity Number: 1149175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £160.00k £156.53k £207.76k £216.82k £188.52k
Total expenditure £156.88k £169.62k £193.99k £204.47k £187.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A