WANDLE VALLEY REGIONAL PARK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment, the preservation of buildings or sites of historic or architectural importance, to provide facilities for recreation or leisure and the relief of unemployment in the Wandle Valley, being the area within 1.6km of the Wandle Valley Regional Park per the London Plan 2011 published by the GLA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Merton
- Sutton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Eleanor Lesley Stringer | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Councillor Leonie Alison Cooper AM | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Judith Mary Helen Gasser | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Jenifer Gould | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Councillor Scott Roche | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Barry Lewis | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jim Foy | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Burton | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|||||
CLARE ELIZABETH NEWILL | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jayne McCoy | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID WEBB | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.96k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.91k | £4.06k | £1.28k | £1.90k | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND RELATING TO THE WANDLE VALLEY AS THE TRUSTEES/DIRECTORS SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT WITHIN THE WANDLE VALLEY. (2) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE IN THE WANDLE VALLEY. (3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE WANDLE VALLEY FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC OR SUCH PERSONS. (4) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST RESIDENTS OF THE WANDLE VALLEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES/DIRECTORS MAY THINK FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. (5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES/DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Book Shop Morden Hall Park
Morden
London
SM4 5JD
- Phone:
- 07818024006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window